California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB712 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2017

Amended

Bill April 17, 2017
Bill March 16, 2017