California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB72 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 16, 2016

Enrolled

Bill September 19, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2017

Amended

Bill July 12, 2017
Bill July 3, 2017
Bill May 30, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017