California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB720 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 15, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2017

Amended

Bill September 7, 2017
Bill July 13, 2017
Bill June 6, 2017
Bill May 15, 2017
Bill April 17, 2017
Bill March 27, 2017