|
10/11/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 657, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 58. Noes 20. Page 3019.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/05/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2471.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/07/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 17. Page 1375.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/06/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 18.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/15/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|