07/10/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2017. | |||
07/10/2017 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 06/26/2017 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/22/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/22/2017 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1680.). | ||
Senate | 06/15/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/14/2017 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). | ||
Senate | 06/01/2017 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/18/2017 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1621.). | ||
Assembly | 05/11/2017 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 10). | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2017 | Read first time. To print. |