Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2017 | Read first time. To print. |