Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/17/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 04/04/2017 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on B. & F. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. | ||
Assembly | 02/15/2017 | Read first time. To print. |