|
10/08/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 583, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
(Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3026.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Bill in its final form passes.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
Vote on concurrence in final form pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
In Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1612.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 845.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|