|
09/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 800, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6874.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 25 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 5661.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1617.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|