California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB836 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2017

Chaptered

Bill September 23, 2017

Amended

Bill July 3, 2017
Bill June 20, 2017
Bill April 25, 2017
Bill April 5, 2017
Bill March 23, 2017