Senate | 08/31/2018 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Glazer. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | Ordered to second reading. | ||
Senate | 06/21/2018 | From inactive file. | ||
Senate | 09/16/2017 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator McGuire. | ||
Senate | 09/01/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). | ||
Senate | 06/26/2017 | In committee: Referred to suspense file. | ||
Senate | 06/06/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 1304.) | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 26). | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2017 | Read first time. To print. |