California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB857 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 13, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 15, 2017

Amended

Bill September 1, 2017
Bill August 23, 2017
Bill July 3, 2017
Bill May 30, 2017