California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB859 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Amended

Bill June 15, 2017
Bill April 27, 2017
Bill April 24, 2017