Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1616.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/05/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/04/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2017
|
Referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/06/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|