Senate
|
05/21/2018
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Allen.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 15).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/16/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 3780.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 4). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/24/2017
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|