|
09/27/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 801, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2018
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6977.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 28).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 24 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5594.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/20/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10 that the measure be re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/04/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/13/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dodd.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/12/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2017
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(b). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2017
|
From Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/11/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 1618.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/03/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|