Senate
|
08/15/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/25/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
From inactive file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2018
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mendoza.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/05/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 6. Page 1264.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|