|
09/20/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 575, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
|
09/20/2018
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2018
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 14. Noes 2.) (August 31).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2018
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2018
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 6080.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2018
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/02/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2018
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3868.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/11/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (January 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. Re-referred. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 4). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|