|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/20/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/13/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 45. Noes 30. Page 3249.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/12/2017
|
From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (September 12).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/07/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 22. Noes 15. Page 2514.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/05/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2017
|
Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2017
|
Withdrawn from committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 19).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/12/2017
|
Re-referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/21/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on EQ. and E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 44. Noes 32. Page 2067.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 6.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/10/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/25/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/19/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 5).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/29/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/28/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|