|
07/10/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 37, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
07/10/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/26/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2017
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/19/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1611.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2017
|
Referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/04/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1388.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/23/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/22/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/19/2017
|
Referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/10/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee February 9.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/09/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|