California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB931 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Amended

Bill August 24, 2018
Bill June 26, 2018
Bill June 12, 2018
Bill April 16, 2018
Bill March 23, 2017