|
10/05/2017
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 503, Statutes of 2017.
|
|
|
|
10/05/2017
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 3112.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2495.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/18/2017
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/17/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 11).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on AGRI.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/08/2017
|
Referred to Coms. on AGRI. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/30/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 4. Page 1797.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/24/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/01/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/27/2017
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2017
|
Re-referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/17/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W.,P., & W. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/27/2017
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|