07/21/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 84, Statutes of 2017. | |||
07/21/2017 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
Assembly | 07/10/2017 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:40 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/03/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 1843.). | ||
Senate | 06/27/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/26/2017 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/07/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Senate | 04/20/2017 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 1145.) | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2017 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 5). | ||
Assembly | 03/23/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2017 | Read first time. To print. |