Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 06/20/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | In committee: Held under submission. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Com. on ED. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2017 | Read first time. To print. |