California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB954 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill September 15, 2017

Chaptered

Bill October 14, 2017

Amended

Bill June 29, 2017
Bill May 4, 2017
Bill March 27, 2017