|
01/12/2018
|
Stricken from file.
|
|
|
|
01/03/2018
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2017
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/19/2017
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2017
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 3124.).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/06/2017
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 8 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/06/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2504.).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2017
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/28/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/10/2017
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/28/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/15/2017
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2017
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2017
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 1885.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 49. Noes 23. Page 1706.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/30/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|