Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2017 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 03/02/2017 | Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and C. & C. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2017 | Read first time. To print. |