California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB984 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 16, 2017

Enrolled

Bill July 21, 2017

Chaptered

Bill August 7, 2017

Amended

Bill July 12, 2017
Bill June 19, 2017
Bill April 20, 2017