Senate
|
08/16/2018
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2018
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/12/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2018
|
Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and V.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/29/2018
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/29/2018
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3866.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/23/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/22/2018
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/18/2018
|
From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/26/2017
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/26/2017
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (March 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/21/2017
|
Coauthors revised.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/02/2017
|
Referred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/17/2017
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 19.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|