Assembly | 02/01/2018 | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | ||
Assembly | 01/31/2018 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2018 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 03/29/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 03/28/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2017 | Re-referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2017 | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and J., E.D., & E. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2017 | Read first time. To print. |