Assembly | 08/31/2018 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Low. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2018 | Reconsideration granted. | ||
Assembly | 09/12/2017 | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Low. | ||
Assembly | 09/12/2017 | Read third time. Refused adoption. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 3228.) | ||
Assembly | 05/30/2017 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). | ||
Assembly | 05/26/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | ||
Assembly | 05/10/2017 | From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (May 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee April 6. | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2017 | Read first time. To print. |