LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA11
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA11
Action History
Assembly
08/22/2017
Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
Assembly
08/21/2017
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended.
Assembly
07/03/2017
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX.
Assembly
03/21/2017
From printer. May be heard in committee April 20.
Assembly
03/20/2017
Read first time. To print.