LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2017-2018 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
ACA14
Action History
CA
California Assembly Bill ACA14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2017-2018 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill ACA14
Action History
Assembly
01/30/2018
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
06/19/2017
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Assembly
06/15/2017
Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HIGHER ED.
Assembly
05/02/2017
From printer. May be heard in committee June 1.
Assembly
05/01/2017
Read first time. To print.