Assembly | 01/08/2018 | In committee: Refused adoption. | ||
Assembly | 05/15/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | ||
Assembly | 05/02/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 05/01/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/27/2017 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 18. | ||
Assembly | 01/18/2017 | Read first time. To print. |