Assembly | 01/03/2018 | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). | ||
Assembly | 06/28/2017 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | ||
Assembly | 05/17/2017 | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 05/16/2017 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. | ||
Assembly | 04/20/2017 | Referred to Com. on E. & R. | ||
Assembly | 01/20/2017 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. | ||
Assembly | 01/19/2017 | Read first time. To print. |