Senate | 01/03/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/15/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3475.) | ||
Assembly | 09/15/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 09/13/2017 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 09/13/2017 | Withdrawn from committee. | ||
Assembly | 09/13/2017 | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 25. Page 3254.) | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 07/05/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2017 | Introduced. To print. |