Assembly | 06/29/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 115, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 06/29/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 06/25/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 06/25/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.) | ||
Senate | 06/14/2018 | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Senate | 06/13/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | ||
Senate | 04/03/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 04/02/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4436.) | ||
Assembly | 03/21/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 20). | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2017 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2017 | Introduced. To print. |