California 2017 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR117 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 06/27/2018

                    Enrolled  June 27, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  June 25, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  April 02, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 117Introduced by Assembly Member ThurmondAugust 21, 2017 Relative to supervised visitation providers.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 117, Thurmond. Supervised visitation providers: training.This measure would recognize the need for statewide conformity in the training of supervised visitation providers, enabling them to foster safe visitation environments for children and their noncustodial parents.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO Bill TextWHEREAS, Circumstances arise that lead to children seeing their parents in supervised visitations, which may include foster care, divorce, domestic violence, child abuse or neglect, substance abuse, or other health issues; andWHEREAS, Nontraditional visits between parents and children under those circumstances can sometimes lead to difficult experiences and feelings for families, especially children; andWHEREAS, Visitation programs, under the guidance of a supervised visitation provider, also known as a supervised visitation monitor, were established in order to address difficulties that can arise in some domestic environments and to arrange and support visitation in a safe environment that allows children to have a relationship with the noncustodial parent; andWHEREAS, Supervised visitation providers are third parties that remain with families for the duration of a visit, providing a safe and supportive environment for parents to have contact with their children; andWHEREAS, Given the inadequate number of professional supervised visitation providers and the potentially prohibitive costs of hiring a professional supervised visitation provider, among other reasons, California allows for a nonprofessional supervised visitation provider, often a family member or a close family friend, to monitor visitation, if certain conditions are met; andWHEREAS, Appropriate and effective training allows supervised visitation providers to ensure a safe visitation environment, fostering productive, positive relationships between children and their noncustodial parents; andWHEREAS, Supervised visitation provider training includes instruction in, among other things, visitation monitoring, child abuse reporting laws, the developmental needs of children, conflicts of interest, and confidentiality; andWHEREAS, Supervised visitation provider training varies by training program, with each program responsible for its own content development; andWHEREAS, California could benefit from uniform statewide standards applied to training programs for supervised visitation providers; now, therefore, be itResolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That in order to protect and support children in supervised visitation, the Legislature recognizes the need for statewide conformity in the training of supervised visitation providers, enabling them to foster safe visitation environments for children and their noncustodial parents; and be it furtherResolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.

 Enrolled  June 27, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  June 25, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  April 02, 2018 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 117Introduced by Assembly Member ThurmondAugust 21, 2017 Relative to supervised visitation providers.LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGESTACR 117, Thurmond. Supervised visitation providers: training.This measure would recognize the need for statewide conformity in the training of supervised visitation providers, enabling them to foster safe visitation environments for children and their noncustodial parents.Digest Key Fiscal Committee: NO 

 Enrolled  June 27, 2018 Passed IN  Senate  June 25, 2018 Passed IN  Assembly  April 02, 2018

Enrolled  June 27, 2018
Passed IN  Senate  June 25, 2018
Passed IN  Assembly  April 02, 2018

 CALIFORNIA LEGISLATURE 20172018 REGULAR SESSION

Assembly Concurrent Resolution No. 117

Introduced by Assembly Member ThurmondAugust 21, 2017

Introduced by Assembly Member Thurmond
August 21, 2017

 Relative to supervised visitation providers.

LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

## LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST

ACR 117, Thurmond. Supervised visitation providers: training.

This measure would recognize the need for statewide conformity in the training of supervised visitation providers, enabling them to foster safe visitation environments for children and their noncustodial parents.

This measure would recognize the need for statewide conformity in the training of supervised visitation providers, enabling them to foster safe visitation environments for children and their noncustodial parents.

## Digest Key

## Bill Text

WHEREAS, Circumstances arise that lead to children seeing their parents in supervised visitations, which may include foster care, divorce, domestic violence, child abuse or neglect, substance abuse, or other health issues; and

WHEREAS, Nontraditional visits between parents and children under those circumstances can sometimes lead to difficult experiences and feelings for families, especially children; and

WHEREAS, Visitation programs, under the guidance of a supervised visitation provider, also known as a supervised visitation monitor, were established in order to address difficulties that can arise in some domestic environments and to arrange and support visitation in a safe environment that allows children to have a relationship with the noncustodial parent; and

WHEREAS, Supervised visitation providers are third parties that remain with families for the duration of a visit, providing a safe and supportive environment for parents to have contact with their children; and

WHEREAS, Given the inadequate number of professional supervised visitation providers and the potentially prohibitive costs of hiring a professional supervised visitation provider, among other reasons, California allows for a nonprofessional supervised visitation provider, often a family member or a close family friend, to monitor visitation, if certain conditions are met; and

WHEREAS, Appropriate and effective training allows supervised visitation providers to ensure a safe visitation environment, fostering productive, positive relationships between children and their noncustodial parents; and

WHEREAS, Supervised visitation provider training includes instruction in, among other things, visitation monitoring, child abuse reporting laws, the developmental needs of children, conflicts of interest, and confidentiality; and

WHEREAS, Supervised visitation provider training varies by training program, with each program responsible for its own content development; and

WHEREAS, California could benefit from uniform statewide standards applied to training programs for supervised visitation providers; now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the Assembly of the State of California, the Senate thereof concurring, That in order to protect and support children in supervised visitation, the Legislature recognizes the need for statewide conformity in the training of supervised visitation providers, enabling them to foster safe visitation environments for children and their noncustodial parents; and be it further

Resolved, That the Chief Clerk of the Assembly transmit copies of this resolution to the author for appropriate distribution.