Assembly | 09/21/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 171, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 09/21/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/13/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/12/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2764.) | ||
Senate | 09/07/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 09/06/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 2951.) | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 28). | ||
Assembly | 08/24/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/22/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/21/2017 | Introduced. To print. |