Assembly | 09/25/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 197, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 09/25/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 09/14/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 09/13/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2844.) | ||
Senate | 09/12/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 09/11/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 09/11/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3147.) | ||
Assembly | 09/08/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 8). | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/31/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 08/30/2017 | Introduced. To print. |