California 2017-2018 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill ACR134 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 1, 2017

Enrolled

Bill February 6, 2018

Chaptered

Bill February 7, 2018

Amended

Bill September 14, 2017
Bill September 13, 2017