Assembly | 04/05/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 04/05/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 03/30/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/30/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 546.) | ||
Senate | 03/28/2017 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/01/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 452.) | ||
Assembly | 02/27/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/13/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (February 13). | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/24/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/23/2017 | Introduced. To print. |