Assembly | 02/07/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 5, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3258.) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2018 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 01/16/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 01/09/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 3717.) | ||
Assembly | 01/08/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 4). | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/04/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/03/2018 | Introduced. To print. |