Assembly
|
08/17/2018
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 143, Statutes of 2018.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2018
|
Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/14/2018
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/13/2018
|
Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5278.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/07/2018
|
Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/06/2018
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/03/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2018
|
In Senate. To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/12/2018
|
Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 4646.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/10/2018
|
From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/03/2018
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Amended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/02/2018
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/08/2018
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/04/2018
|
From printer.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/03/2018
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|