Assembly | 03/09/2017 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 14, Statutes of 2017. | ||
Assembly | 03/09/2017 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 03/07/2017 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/06/2017 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 1. Page 313.) | ||
Senate | 02/15/2017 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/08/2017 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2017 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 59. Noes 4. Page 271.) | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2017 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2017 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (January 30). | ||
Assembly | 01/30/2017 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2017 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2017 | Introduced. To print. |