Assembly | 04/13/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 04/13/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/09/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3679.) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/04/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/20/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4292.) | ||
Assembly | 03/19/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 26). | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2018 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/21/2018 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on RLS. Amended. | ||
Assembly | 02/05/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 01/26/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 01/25/2018 | Introduced. To print. |