Assembly | 03/27/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 28, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 03/27/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 03/22/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3547.) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2018 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 02/28/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 02/20/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4028.) | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 02/12/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (February 12). | ||
Assembly | 02/08/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/07/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/06/2018 | Introduced. To print. |