Assembly | 09/05/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 187, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 09/05/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | ||
Assembly | 08/28/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 08/28/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5898.) | ||
Senate | 08/24/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 08/21/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 6386.) | ||
Assembly | 08/20/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 08/13/2018 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 13). | ||
Assembly | 02/26/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. To print. |