Assembly | 07/10/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 121, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 07/10/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 07/03/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 07/02/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 5044.) | ||
Senate | 05/16/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 05/03/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 05/03/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5004.) | ||
Assembly | 04/26/2018 | Amended. Ordered to Consent Calendar. | ||
Assembly | 04/25/2018 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 24). | ||
Assembly | 03/01/2018 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | ||
Assembly | 02/17/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/16/2018 | Introduced. To print. |