Assembly | 04/24/2018 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 43, Statutes of 2018. | ||
Assembly | 04/24/2018 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. | ||
Assembly | 04/19/2018 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | ||
Senate | 04/19/2018 | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3826.) | ||
Senate | 04/09/2018 | Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2018 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | ||
Senate | 03/21/2018 | From committee: Ordered to third reading. | ||
Senate | 03/12/2018 | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2018 | Adopted and to Senate. (Page 4198.) | ||
Assembly | 03/08/2018 | Coauthors revised. | ||
Assembly | 03/06/2018 | Amended. Ordered to third reading. | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2018 | From committee: Amend, and be adopted as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 5). | ||
Assembly | 03/05/2018 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | ||
Assembly | 02/23/2018 | From printer. | ||
Assembly | 02/22/2018 | Introduced. To print. |